Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Dhas Varuvel, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Kuzhithurai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1951 Born
24 May 197826.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 May 198129.5Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Jun 198533.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Dec 201463.1AppointedBishop of Kuzhithurai, India
24 Feb 201563.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kuzhithurai, India
6 Jun 202068.6ResignedBishop of Kuzhithurai, India

MicroData Summary for Jerome Dhas Varuvel
Bishop Jerome Dhas Varuvel S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kuzhithurai

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaduvoor
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Trinity Central School, Chithirancode

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kuzhithurai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 7 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 22 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,374
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast