Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emeterio Valverde y Téllez

Deceased

Bishop of León, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1864Born
5 Mar 188723.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 190945.4AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
17 Oct 190945.6Ordained BishopBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
26 Dec 194884.8DiedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Emeterio Valverde y Téllez
Bishop Emeterio Valverde y Téllez (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla del Carbón

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast