Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Ippolito Ulivelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chaco, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1879Born
22 Nov 190122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
13 Aug 191940.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco, Bolivia
13 Aug 191940.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
26 Oct 191940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
27 Oct 192243.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Chaco, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Emilio Ippolito Ulivelli
Bishop Emilio Ippolito Ulivelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfiorentino, Italy

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast