Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ferdinand Guidobald von Spaur und Valör

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1705³Born
8 Apr 173024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
20 Mar 178074.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
11 Jun 178074.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
26 Mar 179387.4DiedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ferdinand Guidobald von Spaur und Valör
Bishop Joseph Ferdinand Guidobald von Spaur und Valör (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck
Ordained BishopTheatine, Church, München, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast