Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Waldemar Stanisław Sommertag

Apostolic Nuncio to Sénégal

Titular Archbishop of Traiectum ad Mosam

Apostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde

Apostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau

Apostolic Nuncio to Mauritania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1968 Born
30 May 199325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pelplin, Poland
15 Feb 201850.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
15 Feb 201850.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
19 Mar 201850.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
6 Mar 202254.0CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
6 Sep 202254.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sénégal
6 Sep 202254.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
6 Sep 202254.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
6 Sep 202254.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritania

MicroData Summary for Waldemar Stanisław Sommertag
Archbishop Waldemar Stanisław Sommertag (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sénégal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWięcbork, Poland
Ordained PriestAssumption of Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Pelplin, Diocese of Pelplin, Poland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sénégal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,693
  • r: CB, 10 Mar 2022
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Sep 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022