Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco di Sobrecasas, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645²Born
21 Oct 165914.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Nov 166116.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Sep 168944.7SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
12 Dec 168944.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
24 Feb 169045.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
4 Jan 169853.0DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco di Sobrecasas
Archbishop Francesco di Sobrecasas O.P. (born 1645, died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla de Alfindén, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 232, Number 1,441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 4
  • OP: CB, 14 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast