Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Smith

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1813Born
2 Feb 183623.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 184734.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Jul 184734.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
3 Oct 184734.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
15 Jun 186148.3DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Smith
Bishop Alexander Smith (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuttlebrée, Enzie
Ordained PriestGlasgow
Ordained BishopSt. Andrews, Glasgow, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Death PlaceGlasgow
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Cemetery, Dalberth, Glasgow

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 32
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 20, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Mar 2021

Quantcast