Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Murdoch

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Castabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1796³Born
19 Mar 182124.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 183336.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
8 Mar 183336.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
4 Jun 183336.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Jun 183336.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
20 Oct 183337.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
4 Dec 184650.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Dec 186569.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Murdoch
Bishop John Murdoch (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWellheads, Enzie, Banffshire
Ordained BishopGlasgow
Death PlaceGlasgow
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Church, Abercromby Street, Glasgow

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 44
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 20, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Mar 2021

Quantcast