Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Sicardo Martinez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643²Born
21 May 170259.3AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
6 Aug 170259.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
4 Feb 171471.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Sicardo Martinez
Archbishop José Sicardo Martinez O.S.A. (born 1643, died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopColegio Doña María de Aragón, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,454
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 22, Number 22
  • c34: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 17
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast