Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Salman

Deceased

Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1886Born
20 Jul 191125.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 193246.2SelectedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
5 Jun 193246.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
13 Mar 193347.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
1 Jul 194862.4DiedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan

MicroData Summary for Paul Salman (VIAF: 117276293)
Archbishop Paul Salman (born , died ) Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cairo

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,790

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast