Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Sabbia

Deceased

Bishop of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1814Born
23 Sep 183722.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Crema, Italy
23 Dec 183723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
27 Oct 187157.0AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
26 Nov 187157.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
17 Jun 189378.7DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sabbia (VIAF: 253775683)
Bishop Francesco Sabbia (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrema, Diocese of Crema
Ordained BishopClementine, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 230
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 49
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast