Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1784³Born
Jun 1810³25.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 182540.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limerick, Ireland
30 Sep 182540.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
11 Dec 182541.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
17 Mar 182843.3SucceededBishop of Limerick, Ireland
4 Jun 186479.5DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Ryan
Bishop John Ryan (born Nov 1784, died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurris, Co. Tipperary
Ordained PriestMaynooth College, Chapel
Ordained BishopLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Death PlacePark House, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick
Buried Place (Original)St. John's, Cathedral, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 239, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,311
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast