Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Abraham

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1792¹Born
31 May 181725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Jan 183038.0AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
21 Mar 183038.2Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
23 Jan 183745.0DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Abraham
Bishop William Abraham (born 1792, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnochanore
Buried Place (Original)Holy Trinity, Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,265
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 12
  • op/c1: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast