Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude Humbert de Rolland de Bery

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1708Born
22 Dec 173123.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Jun 173224.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 174941.6SelectedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
19 Jan 175041.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
1 Mar 175041.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
27 Nov 177062.5DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Claude Humbert de Rolland de Bery
Archbishop Claude Humbert de Rolland de Bery (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarigny, Château, Rumilly, Haute-Savoie, Diocese of Grenoble
Ordained BishopSan Filippo, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Death PlaceMoûtiers, Archdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Moûtiers, Archdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast