Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Mamerto Rivas Santos, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barahona, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1932Born
25 Mar 196532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Apr 197643.9AppointedBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
28 Aug 197644.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
7 Dec 199967.5ResignedBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
11 Aug 201886.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Barahona, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Fabio Mamerto Rivas Santos
Bishop Fabio Mamerto Rivas Santos S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barahona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabirmota
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Church, Barahona, Diocese of Barahona
Death PlaceJarabacoa
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Barahona, Diocese of Barahona

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 11 Aug 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast