Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Anton von Pfalz-Neuburg

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1660Born
19 Apr 169130.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Oct 169131.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Mainz, Germany
12 Nov 169131.4SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
8 Jun 169332.9ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
10 Jan 169433.5Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
4 May 169433.9DiedBishop-Elect of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Anton von Pfalz-Neuburg
Bishop Ludwig Anton von Pfalz-Neuburg (born , died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDüsseldorf
Ordained BishopAschaffenberg

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 272, and Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,590

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast