Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Enrique Prado Bolaños

Bishop Emeritus of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1943 Born
3 Dec 196724.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 199248.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
8 Jul 199248.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
22 Aug 199248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
2 Feb 199551.1AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
25 Jul 201571.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tumaco, Colombia
20 May 201773.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Tumaco, Colombia
1 Oct 202076.8RetiredBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julio Enrique Prado Bolaños
Bishop Julio Enrique Prado Bolaños (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCumbal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ipiales, Diocese of Ipiales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pasto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,922
  • ab: CB, 25 Jul 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast