Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Pipia, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1660Born
21 Jan 167716.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1678²17.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 May 172160.6AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Dec 172464.2AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
20 Dec 172464.2Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 172464.2Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo, Italy
29 Jan 172564.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
May 1725³64.5ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
Jan 1727³66.2ResignedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
3 Mar 172968.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
21 Feb 173069.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Pipia
Agostino Cardinal Pipia O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeneghe, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopInterior chapel, Santa Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1724
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 58
  • prof/sole/loc: CB, 14 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast