Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Peláez Caunedo

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1745Born
18 Dec 178641.0AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
6 May 178741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
9 Jul 181165.6DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Peláez Caunedo
Bishop Felipe Peláez Caunedo (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaunedo, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCistercian, Monastery, Otera

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 105, Number 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,540
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,989

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast