Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Aguiar Caamaño

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1734³Born
18 Dec 179763.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
29 Jul 179864.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
12 Nov 181581.7DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Aguiar Caamaño
Bishop Andrés Aguiar Caamaño (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador de Cerbaña

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 118, Number 618
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 30
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast