Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alerano Pallavicino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1803Born
7 Jul 184844.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
7 Jul 184844.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
10 Dec 184845.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
12 Oct 186763.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alerano Pallavicino (VIAF: 89281635)
Archbishop Alerano Pallavicino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Miséricorde (val Saint-Bernard), Savone

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 447
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 65
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,737

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast