Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomáš Pállfy ab Erdöd

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1655AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
12 Dec 1667AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
14 Dec 1671AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
6 May 1679DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Tomáš Pállfy ab Erdöd
Bishop Tomáš Pállfy ab Erdöd (died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPresbourg

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 39
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast