Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Melchior Cardinal Klesl

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

Administrator of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1552Born
1573²20.8Converted
30 Aug 157927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
4 Oct 158836.6AppointedAdministrator of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
15 Jul 161361.4AppointedBishop of Wien, Austria
30 Mar 161462.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
2 Dec 161563.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
9 Apr 161664.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 162371.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
1 Jul 162472.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
18 Sep 163078.5DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior Klesl (VIAF: 62351283)
Melchior Cardinal Klesl (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Diocese of Wien
Ordained BishopKremsmunster
Death PlaceWiener Neustadt, Diocese of Wiener Neustadt
Buried Place (Original)Sankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Diocese of Wien

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256, and Page 368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast