Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Péter Cardinal Pázmány, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1570Born
1596²25.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Nov 161646.1AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
12 Mar 161746.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Nov 162959.1Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 163261.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
19 Mar 163766.4DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Péter Pázmány
Péter Cardinal Pázmány S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOradea Mare, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}, Czechia

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
  • a cardinal for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • ob/c34: CB, 27 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,871
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast