Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Soter Stephen Ortynsky de Labetz, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1866Born
3 Feb 188418.0EnteredMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
18 Jul 189125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
4 Mar 190741.0AppointedBishop of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
4 Mar 190741.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
12 May 190741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
24 Mar 191650.1DiedBishop of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

MicroData Summary for Soter Stephen Ortynsky de Labetz (VIAF: 1821670)
Bishop Soter Stephen Ortynsky de Labetz O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of United States of America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrtynychy, Ukraine
Ordained BishopSt. George's, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Death PlacePhiladelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
Buried Place (Current)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 153
  • prof/c1: CB, 30 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 6 Jan 2021

Quantcast