Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry O’Neill

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1843Born
1867¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 190158.3AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
7 Jul 190158.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
9 Oct 191572.7DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry O’Neill
Bishop Henry O’Neill (born , died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDromore

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast