Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabricius Gabriel (Carbry) O’Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661²Born
1680²19.0Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
17 Mar 171857.2SelectedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
26 Mar 171857.2ConfirmedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
19 Jun 171857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
7 May 1729³68.3DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabricius Gabriel (Carbry) O’Kelly
Bishop Fabricius Gabriel (Carbry) O’Kelly (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCo. Galway
Ordained PriestCaltra
Ordained BishopGlinsk, Co. Galway

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,535
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast