Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹Born
3 Jul 171759.5SelectedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
12 Feb 171860.1ConfirmedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 May 171860.3Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
1732²74.0DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Kelly
Bishop Edmund Kelly (born 1658, died 1732) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Clonfert

  • a bishop for 13.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 72
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast