Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard O’Gara

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1723SelectedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
23 Dec 1723ConfirmedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
24 May 1724³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
20 Apr 1740³DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Gara
Archbishop Bernard O’Gara (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 13
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 97, and Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast