Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Navarro Gilaberte, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653¹Born
21 Jul 170451.5AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
21 Jan 172774.0ResignedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
Feb 172774.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Juan Navarro Gilaberte
Bishop Juan Navarro Gilaberte O. de M. (born 1653, died Feb 1727) Bishop Emeritus of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalatayud
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 24, Number 33
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast