Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Naslian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus per gli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1875³Born
7 Mar 189823.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 191136.7AppointedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
22 Oct 191136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
29 Jun 192853.4ResignedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
29 Jun 192853.4SelectedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus per gli Armeni
1 Jul 192853.4ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus per gli Armeni
15 Sep 195782.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Naslian
Archbishop Jean Naslian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trabzon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarput
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 76
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Sep 2021

Quantcast