Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele (Nicola) Nabaa, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1894Born
15 Apr 191723.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 193137.8SelectedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Nov 193137.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
13 Mar 193339.1ConfirmedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
15 Dec 194652.9DiedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Gabriele (Nicola) Nabaa
Bishop Gabriele (Nicola) Nabaa B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Saïda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoun
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1931, Number 66
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast