Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Najib Mikhael Moussa, O.P.

Archbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1955 Born
4 Oct 198126.0Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
16 May 198731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Dec 201863.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
18 Jan 201963.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
25 Jan 201963.3InstalledArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Najib Mikhael Moussa
Archbishop Najib Mikhael Moussa O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)
Ordained PriestParis, France
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Baghdad, Archdiocese of Baghdad (Chaldean)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • ob/c12: CB, 22 Dec 2018
  • c34: CB, 18 Jan 2019
  • i: CB, 26 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast