Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boutros Mouallem, S.M.S.P.

Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1928 Born
21 Nov 195527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
20 Apr 199061.9AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jun 199062.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jul 199870.2AppointedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
18 Jul 200375.1RetiredArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Boutros Mouallem
Archbishop Boutros Mouallem S.M.S.P. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAïlaboun
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast