Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Mikhail Moskal

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1937 Born
12 Apr 196224.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
25 Mar 196325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 Aug 198143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 Aug 198143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
13 Oct 198143.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
5 Dec 198346.1AppointedBishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA
29 Jul 200971.7RetiredBishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Mikhail Moskal
Bishop Robert Mikhail Moskal (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Josaphat in Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarnegie, PA
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2009
  • od/c0: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,597

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast