Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrozij Andrew Senyshyn, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1903Born
7 Apr 192522.1ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Aug 193128.4Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
23 Aug 193128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
6 Jul 194239.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
6 Jul 194239.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maina
22 Oct 194239.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maina
20 Jul 195653.4AppointedApostolic Exarch of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
10 Jul 195855.3AppointedBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
14 Aug 196158.4AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
11 Sep 197673.5DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Ambrozij Andrew Senyshyn (VIAF: 254696847)
Archbishop Ambrozij Andrew Senyshyn O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStary Sambir, Ukraine
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 55
  • prof: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast