Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bartolomeo Menocchio, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1741Born
25 Feb 176422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Dec 179554.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
22 May 179655.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
2 Apr 180059.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
25 Mar 182382.0DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bartolomeo Menocchio
Bishop Giuseppe Bartolomeo Menocchio O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmagnola
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia, Italy

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 451
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,506
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • name/bp: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast