Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Melitón Chávez

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1957Born
29 Nov 198528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Oct 201558.2AppointedBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
4 Dec 201558.4Ordained BishopBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
16 Oct 201962.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Concepción, Argentina
19 Mar 202062.7SucceededBishop of Concepción, Argentina
25 May 202163.8DiedBishop of Concepción, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Melitón Chávez
Bishop José Melitón Chávez (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRomero Pozo, Archdiocese of Tucumán
Ordained Bishopanfiteatro “Padro Aroldo Suárez”, Añatuya, Diocese of Añatuya
Death PlaceCentro de Salud, Hospital, Tucumán, Archdiocese of Tucumán

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 18 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,680
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2019
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020
  • d: CB, 26 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 May 2021

Quantcast