Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McLaughlin

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Feb 1837AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland
21 Feb 1837AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
16 Jul 1837Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
18 Aug 1840SucceededBishop of Derry, Ireland
18 Jun 1864DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John McLaughlin
Bishop John McLaughlin (died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBishop's, Chapel, Derry, Diocese of Derry

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 97, and Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast