Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maria Mascardi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1662Born
16 Jun 168522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
7 Apr 171047.7AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
1 May 171047.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
9 Dec 173169.4DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Mascardi
Bishop Carlo Maria Mascardi B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarzana
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 5
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast