Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Manoel Cardinal da Câmara

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1685Born
10 Apr 174761.2Elevated to Cardinal
9 Mar 175468.2SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 May 175468.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Jul 175468.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
9 Jul 175872.5DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Manoel da Câmara
José Manoel Cardinal da Câmara (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtalaia, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceAtalaia, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Buried Place (Original)Nossa Senhora da Asunção, Church, Atalaia, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 424
  • ob/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast