Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apollonio Lupi, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1670Born
18 May 168514.9ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
16 May 169322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
28 Nov 172959.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
8 Dec 172959.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
5 Feb 174170.6DiedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)

MicroData Summary for Apollonio Lupi (VIAF: 304917250)
Bishop Apollonio Lupi C.R.L. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManerbio, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vicoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,868
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • ob/c2: AT, 1 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast