Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Franz Linneborn, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Dacca, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1864Born
20 Apr 188924.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 190944.7AppointedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
11 Apr 190944.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
24 Dec 190945.5InstalledBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
21 Jul 191551.1DiedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Frederick Franz Linneborn
Bishop Frederick Franz Linneborn C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Dacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuesten
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast