Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Han Lim Moon

Coadjutor Bishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1955 Born
12 Oct 198429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
6 Feb 201458.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Martín, Argentina
6 Feb 201458.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
4 May 201458.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
5 Dec 202065.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Han Lim Moon
Bishop Han Lim Moon (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Venado Tuerto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuwon, Korea (South)
Ordained BishopJesús Buen Pastor, Cathedral, San Martín, Diocese of San Martín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Venado Tuerto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2014
  • c1/ob: CB, 6 Feb 2014
  • tdio: CB, 12 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,150
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Mar 2021

Quantcast