Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Liu Hsien Tang (Liu Xiantang)

Bishop Emeritus of Hsinchu, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1928 Born
30 Nov 195627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Taipei, Taiwan
21 Mar 196132.2IncardinatedPriest of Hsinchu, Taiwan
24 Oct 198051.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
1 Jan 198152.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
29 Jun 198354.5SucceededBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
4 Dec 200475.9RetiredBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Lucas Liu Hsien Tang (Liu Xiantang)
Bishop Lucas Liu Hsien Tang (Liu Xiantang) (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hsinchu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTung Shung Tan
Ordained BishopImmaculate Heart of Mary, Cathedral, Hsinchu, Diocese of Hsinchu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hsinchu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,097

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast