Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurus Libaba

Deceased

Bishop of Lindi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1928Born
19 Sep 196234.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mtwara, Tanzania
18 Dec 197244.8AppointedBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania
19 Mar 197345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania
17 Oct 198658.7AppointedBishop of Lindi, Tanzania
3 Mar 198860.0DiedBishop of Lindi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Maurus Libaba
Bishop Maurus Libaba (born , died ) Bishop of Lindi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkowe
Ordained BishopOur Lady Help of Christians, Abbey, Ndanda, Diocese of Mtwara

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,114
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast