Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop León Kruk

Deceased

Bishop of San Rafael, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1926Born
18 Sep 195427.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 197346.1AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
17 Mar 197346.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
7 Sep 199164.7DiedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina

MicroData Summary for León Kruk
Bishop León Kruk (born , died ) Bishop of San Rafael

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApóstoles
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosario, Cathedral, Corrientes, Archdiocese of Corrientes

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast