Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. MichaŽl Kozal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Lappa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1893Born
23 Feb 191824.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 193945.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
10 Jun 193945.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lappa
13 Aug 193945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lappa
26 Jan 194349.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
14 Jun 1987Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. MichaŽl Kozal
Bishop Bl. MichaŽl Kozal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowy Folwark

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1939, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast