Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Kémérer, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Posadas, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1908Born
30 Oct 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Mar 195748.5AppointedBishop of Posadas, Argentina
8 Jun 195748.7Ordained BishopBishop of Posadas, Argentina
6 Jul 195748.8InstalledBishop of Posadas, Argentina
16 Jun 198677.7RetiredBishop of Posadas, Argentina
26 Jun 199889.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Posadas, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Kémérer
Bishop Jorge Kémérer S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Posadas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael (Entre Ríos)
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Basilica, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,856
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast