Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Youlios Kackanatt

Bishop Emeritus of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1944 Born
10 Oct 197026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
12 Oct 200763.3SelectedBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India
18 Jan 200863.6ConfirmedBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India
9 Feb 200863.6Ordained BishopBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India
11 Jun 201975.0RetiredBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Abraham Youlios Kackanatt
Bishop Abraham Youlios Kackanatt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Muvattupuzha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKallooppara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Muvattupuzha, Eparchy of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,674
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast